Fonseca Sheridan, Adriana del Pilar (CPSO#: 92858)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: Fonseca Gonzalez, Adriana del Pilar (used until: 06 May 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Colegio Mayor De Ntra Sra Del Rosario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Hematology/Oncology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7742
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kid-E-Care
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 301
Toronto ON  M5N1A8
Canada
Phone: 4168606696
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADRIANA DEL PILAR FONSECA SHERIDAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FONSECA SHERIDAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015