Foo, Cheryl (CPSO#: 93179)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017