Forbath, Peter Gyorgy (CPSO#: 17077)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 03 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jul 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Hungarian

Education:Franz Joseph University of Kolozsvar, 1949

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 10 Nov 1959 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1959
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 2018

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: January 6, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Peter G. Forbath to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 6, 2018:

Dr. Forbath has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.