Forbes, Amy Rosemarie Jean (CPSO#: 92769)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
333 Lakeshore Road West
2nd Floor
Mississauga ON  L5H 1G9
Phone: (905) 274-7055
Fax: (905) 274-0227
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMY ROSEMARIE JEAN FORBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORBES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2012