Forbes, Eleanor Melissa (CPSO#: 84927)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: Forbes-Hoskins, Eleanor Melissa (used until: 14 Jan 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Valley Family Health Team
95 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone: (613) 256-9370
Fax: (613) 256-0949
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 432-4851
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

2675 Concession
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Canada
Phone: (613) 258-3435
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

Perth & Smiths Falls District Hosp
60 Cornelia Street West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Canada
Phone: (613) 283-2330
Fax: (613) 283-8990
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Canada
Phone: (613) 623-3166
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Canada
Phone: (613) 257-2200
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
Phone: (613) 774-2420
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Melissa Forbes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Forbes ( CPSO# 84927 )

Business Address:
75 Spring Street
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Phone Number: (613) 256-2500

Business Address:
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Business Address:
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-3435

Business Address:
350 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-3166

Business Address:
Winchester DM Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0

Business Address:
60 Cornealia West
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9

Business Address:
211 Lake Avenue East
Carleton Place ON  K7C 1J4
Phone Number: (613) 257-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELEANOR MELISSA FORBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORBES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2009