Ford, Derek Thomas (CPSO#: 72358)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 May 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 May 2004

Summary

Former Name: Brzozowski, Dariusz (used until: 10 Oct 2001 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7 St Thomas Street
Suite 410
Toronto ON  M5S 2B7
Phone: (416) 925-7337
Fax: (416) 928-0716
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oshawa Centre
Executive Tower
Suite 305
419 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K5
Canada
Phone: (905) 743-9888
Fax: (416) 928-0716
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Derek T Ford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ford ( CPSO# 72358 )

Business Address:
Oshawa Centre
Executive Tower
305 - 419 King Street West
Oshawa ON  L1J 2K4

Business Address:
Suite 410
7 St. Thomas Street
Toronto ON  M5S 2B7
Phone Number: (888) 925-7337

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEREK THOMAS FORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 May 2004