Forero Mantilla, Carlos Mauricio (CPSO#: 87985)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 17 Feb 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Industrial De Santander, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare Hamilton
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: 9055221155 Ext. 33855
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Feb 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 14 Feb 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 15 Feb 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 01 Jul 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2015 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Carlos Mauricio Forero Mantilla may practise medicine only:

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Anaesthesia,  McMaster  University,  in  which  Dr. Forero Mantilla
                        holds  an academic appointment at the rank of Associate  Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate  of  registration  automatically  expires when Dr. Forero
                  Mantilla no longer holds the appointment referred to in clause 1.