Forester, Kimberly Ann (CPSO#: 91072)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cottage Country Family Health Team
5 Pineridge Gate
Gravenhurst ON  P1P 1Z3
Phone: (705) 687-2271
Fax: (705) 687-7575
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kimberley Forester Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Forester ( CPSO# 91072 )

Business Address:
Cottage Country Family Health Team
5 Pineridge Gate
Gravenhurst ON  P1P 1Z3
Phone Number: (705) 687-2273

Business Address:
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone Number: (705) 645-4404

Business Address:
200 Kelly Drive
Gravenhurst ON  P1P 1P3
Phone Number: (705) 687-3444

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIMBERLY ANN FORESTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORESTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011