Forgeron, Robert John (CPSO#: 81630)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Lake Erie College of Osteopathic Medicin, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 26 Oct 2007 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2004
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Jul 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 May 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jun 2008