Forson, Agatha (CPSO#: 26372)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 12 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Ghana

Education:National University of Ireland, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Agatha Forson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 27 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Jun 2018