Forth, Penny Lee (CPSO#: 96225)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 09 Jan 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 29 Jul 2014 to 15 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 16 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 09 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jan 2017