Fortier, Anne Michelle (CPSO#: 79665)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 39
1111 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8X2
Phone: (905) 853-1212
Fax: (905) 853-1214
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anne M. Fortier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fortier ( CPSO# 79665 )

Business Address:
Suite 39
1111 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8X2
Phone Number: (905) 853-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Dec 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE MICHELLE FORTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORTIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2004 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2009