Fortin-Langelier, Benjamin (CPSO#: 96506)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Center
1145 Carling ave
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Fax: 6136834404
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fortin-Langelier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Fortin-Langelier ( CPSO# 96506 )

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN FORTIN-LANGELIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORTIN-LANGELIER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016