Fortinsky, Kyle Joshua (CPSO#: 97900)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 45644
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

301 - 5 Quarry Ridge Rd
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Canada
Phone: (705) 334-4232
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

23 - 15 Gallue Crt
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Canada
Phone: (705) 334-4232
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kyle Fortinsky Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Fortinsky ( CPSO# 97900 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
301 - 5 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 334-4232

Business Address:
23/24 - 15 Gallie Court
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 334-4232

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 03 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KYLE JOSHUA FORTINSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORTINSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016