Forward, Karen Elaine (CPSO#: 87026)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1200 Main Street W.
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 75155
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Forward Haverstock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Forward ( CPSO# 87026 )
Dr. J. Haverstock ( CPSO# 90749 )

Business Address:
MUMC Department of Pediatrics
1200 Main Street West
Suite 2N491
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
North Oakville Medical
310 - 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (289) 813-2004

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN ELAINE FORWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FORWARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 04 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2011