Fournier, Marc Robert (CPSO#: 91047)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Star Endoscopy Unit 207 1081 Carling Avenue Ottawa, ON K1Y 4G2 Tel: 613-729-3179
Date Received: 27 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 04 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 28 Jul 2009
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014