Fowler, John Harvey (CPSO#: 17083)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 1. Michael Garron Hospital 825 Coxwell Ave, East York, ON M4C 3E7 Phone: (416) 461-8272 2. Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre 2075 Bayview Ave, Toronto, ON M4N 3M5 Phone: (416) 480-6100 3. Bridgepoint Active Healthcare 1 Bridgepoint Dr, Toronto, ON M4M 2B5 Phone: (416) 461-8252 4. Providence Healthcare 3276 St Clair Ave E, Scarborough, ON M1L 1W1 Phone: (416) 285-3666
Date Received: 04 Jun 2018


Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may leave a message for Dr. Fowler at: Tel: 416-483-5106 with their contact information and records request so that Dr. Fowler may contact them regarding their request
Date Received: 31 Jan 2008

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 14 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2018