Fowler, Melinda Joye (CPSO#: 92803)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
886 Main Street
Winnipeg MB  R2W 5L4
Phone: (204) 582-2311
Fax: 2045826006
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Box 219 2 Bear Road
Scanterbury MB  R0E1W0
Canada
Phone: 204-766-7011
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELINDA JOYE FOWLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FOWLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2016