Fox, Susan Helen (CPSO#: 75984)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Oct 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 23 Oct 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Manchester, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Movement Disorder Clinic
399 Bathurst Street MC7 421
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6422
Fax: (416) 603-5004
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Susan Fox Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Fox ( CPSO# 75984 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Movement Disorder Clinic
399 Bathurst Street
MC7.421
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-6422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 23 Oct 2003 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Apr 2001 to 15 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2010 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Susan Helen Fox may practise medicine only,

                  (a)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        University   of  Toronto,  in  which  Dr.  Fox  holds  an  academic
                        appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (b)   in accordance with the requirement of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  when  Dr. Fox no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.