Francescutti, Valerie Amanda (CPSO#: 82405)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Feb 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
6 North
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44619
Fax: (905) 575-2633
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Valerie Francescutti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 07 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Francescutti ( CPSO# 82405 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
237 Barton Street East
6 North
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VALERIE AMANDA FRANCESCUTTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANCESCUTTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2018