Francis, Julie-Ann Ronelle (CPSO#: 75161)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Yale University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 4423
Fax: (613) 344-1699
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julie-Ann Francis Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Francis ( CPSO# 75161 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
76 Stuart Street
Victory 4
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIE-ANN RONELLE FRANCIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANCIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Nov 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Dec 2006 to 30 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Oncology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Dec 2007 to 31 Mar 2008
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 2007