Frank, Jason Russell (CPSO#: 71217)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department Of Emergency Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79002
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus - Emergency
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frank Farey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Frank ( CPSO# 71217 )
Dr. R. Farey ( CPSO# 72705 )

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital - General Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
2 Valour Drive
Ottawa ON  K1G 3T5
Phone Number: (613) 260-7144


Corporation Name: J.R. Frank Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Frank ( CPSO# 71217 )
Dr. R. Farey ( CPSO# 72705 )

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8000

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JASON RUSSELL FRANK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRANK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002