Frankford, Robert Timothy Stansfield (CPSO#: 22376)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Date of Death: 1-Aug-2015

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of London, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients requesting a copy of medical records may contact: Seaton House 339 George St. Toronto, ON M5A 2N2
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013