Fraser, Amy Barbara (CPSO#: 77628)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department Of Anesthesia
Room B302
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4940
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

501 Smyth Road
Ottawa, ON
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 78187
Fax: (613) 737-8189
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa, ON
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

1141 Carling Avenue
Ottawa, ON
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Canada
Phone: (613) 722-6521
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amy B. Fraser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fraser ( CPSO# 77628 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
1053 Carling Avenue
Room B302
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E2
Phone Number: (613) 761-4940

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Room CCW1401
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8187

Business Address:
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8531

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMY BARBARA FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007