Fraser, Emily Joan (CPSO#: 93191)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
350 Victoria St
181 Kerr Hall West
Toronto ON  M5B 2K3
Phone: (416) 979-5070
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Morant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Fraser ( CPSO# 93191 )
Dr. K. Morant ( CPSO# 93668 )

Business Address:
Corcare
325 Milner Avenue
Scarborough ON  M1B 5N1
Phone Number: (416) 284-4744

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EMILY JOAN FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012