Fraser, Graeme Andrew McCrae (CPSO#: 72231)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Room 3-85
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Fax: (905) 575-6340
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Graeme A. M. Fraser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Fraser ( CPSO# 72231 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 575-7820

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 23 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRAEME ANDREW MCCRAE FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2003