Fraser, Lisa-Ann (CPSO#: 81045)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: McKeough, Lisa-Ann (used until: 20 Nov 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
140 Oxford St. E., Suite 410
London ON  N6A 5R9
Phone: 226-680-0802
Fax: 226-680-0800
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fraser & Fraser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Fraser ( CPSO# 81045 )
Dr. J. Fraser ( CPSO# 79145 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
Room B7-104
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3702

Business Address:
410 - 140 Oxford Street East
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (226) 680-0802

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA-ANN FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009