Fraser, Margaret Ann (CPSO#: 61708)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8500
Fax: (613) 737-8957
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Margaret Ann Fraser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Fraser ( CPSO# 61708 )

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
2555 St. Joseph Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1C 1S6
Phone Number: (613) 824-3252

Business Address:
1145 Hunt Club Road
Ottawa ON  K1V 0Y3
Phone Number: (613) 738-2378

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 28 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET ANN FRASER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRASER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1989