Fraser, Robert Blair (CPSO#: 25614)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R. B. Fraser Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Fraser ( CPSO# 25614 )

Business Address:
301 - 21 Surrey Street West
Guelph ON  N1H 3R3
Phone Number: (519) 836-7240

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 301-21 Surrey Street, Guelph, ON N1H 3R3
Date Received: 31 May 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018