Frederiksen, Lisa Jill (CPSO#: 91194)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maple Family Health Team
Unit D2
1036 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H2
Phone: (613) 546-9721
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Frederiksen Krol Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Krol ( CPSO# 95558 )
Dr. L. Frederiksen ( CPSO# 91194 )

Business Address:
Maple Family Health Team
Unit D2
1036 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1H2
Phone Number: (613) 546-9721

Business Address:
Quinte Health Care
Belleville General Hospital
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA JILL FREDERIKSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREDERIKSEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013