Freedman, Orit Chaya (CPSO#: 77925)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. x2804
Fax: 905-721-6103
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence ave E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Canada
Phone: (416) 431-8113
Fax: 416-431-8279
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Orit Freedman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Freedman ( CPSO# 77925 )

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 431-8113

Business Address:
Durham Regional Cancer Centre
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ORIT CHAYA FREEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEDMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008