Freeman, Laura Michele (CPSO#: 97397)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
2401 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone: (416) 485-9044
Fax: (416) 485-8525
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Apr 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURA MICHELE FREEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Apr 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2015