Freeman, Marc Andrew (CPSO#: 74713)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite G02
2300 Eglinton Ave West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 828-0653
Fax: (895) 828-0765
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc Freeman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Freeman ( CPSO# 74713 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
45 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2N 5W9

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1

Business Address:
Suite G02
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8

Business Address:
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC ANDREW FREEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREEMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005