Freire-Lizama, Tatiana (CPSO#: 71512)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
15th Floor Cardinal Carter Wing
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 2395
Fax: (416) 864-6073
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Freire-Lizama Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Freire-Lizama ( CPSO# 71512 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
15th Floor Cardinal Carter Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Business Address:
Women's Health Centre
4th Floor
61 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 2T2
Phone Number: (416) 867-7484

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TATIANA FREIRE-LIZAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREIRE-LIZAMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2003