Freistatter, Ryan Lance (CPSO#: 88333)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2nd Floor
101 McIntyre St West
North Bay ON  P1B 2Y5
Phone: (705) 472-7577
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.L. Freistatter Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 18 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RYAN LANCE FREISTATTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREISTATTER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2010