French, Roberta Joan (CPSO#: 73180)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jun 2002