French, Susan Elizabeth (CPSO#: 75130)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: White, Susan Elizabeth (used until: 10 Jan 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan French Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 14 2014

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Please contact the hospital where treatment was received for medical record inquiries.
Date Received: 14 Jul 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jul 2015