Freundlich, George Valentine (CPSO#: 68525)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 May 2018

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hungarian, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Bingham Memorial Hospital Matheson
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  January 16, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On January 16, 2018, MICs Group of Health Services (comprising Bingham Memorial Hospital, Anson General Hospital, and Lady Minto Hospital) notified the College, pursuant to s. 33(c) of the Public Hospitals Act and s. 85.2(1) and 85.5(1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, that effective from January 10, 2018, Dr. George Valentine Freundlich voluntarily agreed not to exercise his privileges at MICs.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1994
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 May 2018
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 14 May 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 14 May 2018 Active View Details [+]
            As from May 14, 2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. George Valentine
            Freundlich in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr.
            Freundlich to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Freundlich has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in all
                  jurisdictions.