Frewen, Timothy Christopher (CPSO#: 33008)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: LHSC Health Information Management Department 800 Commissioners Road East London ON N6A 5W9
Date Received: 30 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018