Freytag, Angelika Gabriele (CPSO#: 75940)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German, Italian

Education:Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brockville General Hospital
78 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V1S8
Phone: 6133455649
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Freytag Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Freytag ( CPSO# 75940 )

Business Address:
75 Charles Street
Brockville ON  K6V 1S8
Phone Number: (613) 345-5645

Business Address:
2867 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brockville General Hospital Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 07 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELIKA GABRIELE FREYTAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FREYTAG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2011