Fried, Eve Lyn Miriam (CPSO#: 79058)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jan 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
8077 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4L 7X7
Phone: (905) 850-0004
Fax: (905) 850-0006
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Eve and Ben-Ari Fried Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Fried ( CPSO# 84655 )
Dr. E. Fried ( CPSO# 79058 )

Business Address:
Etobicoke General Hospital-WOHS
Department of Anesthesia
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Business Address:
Suite 207
8077 Islington Avenue
Woodbridge ON  L4L 7X7
Phone Number: (905) 850-0004

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Dec 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVE LYN MIRIAM FRIED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIED is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2009