Friedland, Michael Jonathan (CPSO#: 60200)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100 Ext. 7628
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Plastic Surgery Clinic
1421 Hurontario St
Mississauga, ON
Mississauga ON  L5G 3H5
Canada
Phone: (905) 278-7077
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

The Mississauga Cosmetic Surgery
& Laser Clinic
247Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 273-3045
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge, ON
Rainy River ON  N1R 3G2
Canada
Phone: (519) 621-2330
County: District of Rainy River
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael J. Friedland Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Friedland ( CPSO# 60200 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
Mississauga Site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 627-1887

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom
USA - Arizona

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JONATHAN FRIEDLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIEDLAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1991