Friedlander, Mark (CPSO#: 58674)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pinnacle Health Centre
9651 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C1V7
Phone: 905-7808823
Fax: 905-7808821
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St
Toronto ON  M2K1E1
Canada
Phone: 416-7566000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Allevio Pain Clinic
240 Duncan Mill Rd #101
Toronto ON  M3B 3S6
Canada
Phone: (416) 840-5990
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mark Friedlander Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Friedlander ( CPSO# 58674 )

Business Address:
9651 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 1V7
Phone Number: (905) 780-8823

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK FRIEDLANDER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIEDLANDER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1987