Friedlander, Richard (CPSO#: 96594)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 18 Nov 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Nov 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2011 to 28 Aug 2011
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2013 to 18 Nov 2013
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2013