Friedlander, Sam Abe (CPSO#: 30664)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yiddish

Education:McGill University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010

Medical Records Location

Address: 210 - 840 Coxwell Avenue Toronto, ON M4C 5T2
Date Received: 18 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 27 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018