Friedman, Jonathan Shimon (CPSO#: 78048)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN SHIMON FRIEDMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRIEDMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Apr 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2004