Friend, William Clark (CPSO#: 59210)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Alberta Hospital Edmonton P.O. Box 307 17480 Fort Rd Edmonton AB T5J 2J7
Date Received: 01 Jun 2018

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018