Frye, Helen Lenore (CPSO#: 29250)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 May 1986

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Alexandra Medical Centre
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone: (519) 485-9617
Fax: (519) 485-9620
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Helen Frye Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Frye ( CPSO# 29250 )

Business Address:
Alexandra Medical Centre/Hospital
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 485-9618

Business Address:
Lady Dunn Health Centre
17 Government Road
Wawa ON  P0S 1K0
Phone Number: (705) 856-2335

Business Address:
525 Causley Street
Blind River ON  P0R 1B0
Phone Number: (705) 356-1220

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Lady Dunn Health Centre Wawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HELEN LENORE FRYE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRYE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Sep 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1986

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 16, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)