Fu, Lisa Wenyang (CPSO#: 102710)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210 2330
2330 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1T 0A2
Phone: (416) 335-1717
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 4S-412
30 Sunnyside Avenue
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (647) 346-7766
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Canada
Phone: (416) 291-7719
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Suite 404-K Wing
650 Sammon Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 465-7999
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lisa Fu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Fu ( CPSO# 102710)

Business Address:
East Wing of the Sunnyside Building
30 Sunnyside Avenue
Suite 4S-412
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (647) 346-7766

Business Address:
Suite 210
2330 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1T 0A2
Phone Number: (416) 335-1717

Business Address:
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone Number: (416) 291-7719

Business Address:
404 - K Wing
650 Sammon Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone Number: (416) 465-7999

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 04 Nov 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA WENYANG FU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 10 Mar 2014 to 06 Apr 2014
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 05 May 2014 to 01 Jun 2014
Elective Trainee - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2016