Fu, Ping (CPSO#: 65239)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-2041
Fax: (905) 883-2138
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ping Fu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Fu ( CPSO# 65239 )

Business Address:
York Central Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-2041

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3946

Business Address:
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 13 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 27 Nov 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PING FU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993